Financial history SOCIETY FOR RESEARCH INTO HIGHER EDUCATION

Charity number: 313850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £856.72k £612.10k £611.87k £609.45k £819.41k
Total expenditure £946.70k £637.85k £682.64k £689.42k £674.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.00k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £15.06k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £831.22k £583.34k £587.34k £582.55k £791.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.50k £13.77k £9.53k £11.90k £13.30k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £945.30k £636.67k £682.28k £688.66k £668.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.40k £1.18k £351 £765 £5.90k
Expenditure - Governance £6.40k £6.74k £7.40k £7.54k £8.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £58 £5.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0