Financial history THE WINSTON CHURCHILL MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 313952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.32m £576.64k £592.39k £1.31m £2.81m
Total expenditure £2.51m £2.26m £2.46m £3.04m £3.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £560.44k £54.58k £63.94k £543.02k £1.85m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £759.39k £522.06k £528.45k £763.25k £954.69k
Income - Other £1.36k £0 £0 £2.00k £236
Income - Legacies £2.00k £20.86k £36.67k £5.02k £210.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.22m £1.93m £2.09m £2.65m £2.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £298.65k £334.28k £364.92k £394.09k £412.62k
Expenditure - Governance £87.54k £107.68k £125.16k £140.50k £30.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £173.38k £189.27k £197.74k £185.05k £178.14k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0