TALL SHIPS YOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Tall Ships Youth Trust is dedicated to the personal development of young people through the crewing of Tall Ships. Its principal activities are to provide opportunities for young people to go to sea on the Trust's ocean going sail training vessels and to promote sail training internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income:
£1,893,250
Donations and legacies | £1.10m | |
Charitable activities | £781.38k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £7.52k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,847,741
Raising funds | £360.72k | |
Charitable activities | £1.49m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £360.72k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.49m | |
Retained for future use | £45.51k |
People

21 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
445 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 April 2004: Standard registration
- THE SAIL TRAINING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Owen Aisher | Chair | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zafar Rushdie | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Layng | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Verghese-Dipple | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Brown | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Martyn | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bradshaw | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philippe dOrnano | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicholas James Andrews | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Edwards | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15m | £1.35m | £1.30m | £1.75m | £1.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.94m | £1.31m | £1.53m | £1.76m | £1.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £80.82k | £33.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.38m | £1.19m | £833.47k | £1.16m | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.94k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £757.58k | £87.45k | £425.89k | £586.94k | £781.38k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.54k | £2.18k | £2.32k | £3.39k | £7.52k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £70.82k | £33.66k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £290.82k | £25.56k | £15.67k | £74.85k | £23.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.59m | £1.00m | £1.20m | £1.39m | £1.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £337.39k | £305.66k | £329.54k | £371.67k | £360.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.66k | £26.90k | £41.64k | £39.32k | £54.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £11.06k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.40m | £1.29m | £1.16m | £1.89m | £1.75m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £588.23k | £657.51k | £485.44k | £323.27k | £294.57k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£241.84k | -£240.36k | -£178.18k | -£92.60k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.19m | £1.11m | £1.09m | £903.22k | £780.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 10 January 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 28 February 2025 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 12TH JUNE 1956 AS AMENDED ON 10TH NOVEMBER 1960 AND 20TH SEPTEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 4 DECEMBER 2002, 1 AUGUST 2003 & 3 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE TRAINING OF YOUNG MEN AND YOUNG WOMEN OF ALL NATIONALITIES IN SAILING AND SEAMANSHIP PARTICULARLY BY THE USE OF SAIL TRAINING SHIPS AND SEA SCHOOLS; TO PROMOTE AMONG YOUNG PERSONS INTEREST IN TAKING UP SEA-GOING CAREERS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO SERVICE IN THE ROYAL NAVY AND MERCANTILE MARINE; AND TO MAKE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC A KNOWLEDGE OF UP TO DATE DEVELOPMENTS IN THE SCIENCE OF SEAMANSHIP AND SAILING
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 23 April 2004 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A THE HARD
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 3PT
- Phone:
- 02392832055
- Email:
- info@tallships.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window