Financial history THE OLD JOHNIAN CHARITY LIMITED

Charity Number: 325117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.35k £14.06k £19.02k £16.22k £19.46k
Total expenditure £5.98k £12.01k £6.21k £22.05k £5.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A