THE OLD JOHNIAN CHARITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Charity is the provision of financial assistance for pupils at The Saint John's School Foundation, Leatherhead, who through the necessitous circumstances of their parents or guardians require help in order to complete their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 October 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Lattaney Peake FCA | Chair | 05 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Anthony Maurice Airey | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Roberts | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK SHRUBBS COOTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP WEATHERLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.35k | £14.06k | £19.02k | £16.22k | £19.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.98k | £12.01k | £6.21k | £22.05k | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 AUG 1974
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AT ST. JOHN'S FOUNDATION SCHOOL FOR THE SONS OF THE CLERGY, LEATHERHEAD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARLEY END
SHOPHOUSE LANE
ALBURY
GUILDFORD
GU5 9EQ
- Phone:
- 01483202993
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window