SYLVIA WRIGHT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust raises funds for the support of the running costs of a school for deaf children, a day care centre for disabled children and a Nursing Training College in Tiruvannamalai, Tamil Nadu District, South India. These provide better health care, education and training for poor and disabled people in that area of India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
- India
Governance
- 18 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TONY ALLINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mary Bernadette Barnes | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
FINOLA FOX | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA MASCARENHAS | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT WILLIAM GIBBONS | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Woodhead | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
MRS SUE WILSON | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOWLEY | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SANDERSON | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|||||
GLENN MILLER | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CRAVEN GILPIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR GEOFF FULLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.78k | £170.32k | £151.38k | £132.92k | £137.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.14k | £130.26k | £141.19k | £192.74k | £172.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JUNE 1982 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4 APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING TO COLLECT SUMS OF MONEY AND TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME INTO THE TRUST FUND FOR SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 KINGS ROAD
BRAMHOPE
LEEDS
LS16 9JN
- Phone:
- 01132675735
- Email:
- chairman@sylviawright.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window