Trustees SYLVIA WRIGHT TRUST
Charity Number: 326139

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TONY ALLINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mary Bernadette Barnes | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
FINOLA FOX | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA MASCARENHAS | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT WILLIAM GIBBONS | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Woodhead | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
MRS SUE WILSON | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOWLEY | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SANDERSON | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|||||
GLENN MILLER | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CRAVEN GILPIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR GEOFF FULLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.