ANDREW BUCHANAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 326796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Mainly supporting organisations in Nottinghamshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £950
Total expenditure: £950

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR ANDREW GEORGE BUCHANAN Chair
THE ARMOR INCUMBENT TRUST
Received: On time
GEORGE BUCHANAN Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record
LADY BELINDA JANE BUCHANAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.50k £3.01k £5.08k £1.00k £950
Total expenditure £3.15k £3.86k £2.46k £950 £950
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 June 2024 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 06 April 2023 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HODSOCK PRIORY FARM
HODSOCK
WORKSOP
S81 0TY
Phone:
07970984327
Website:

No information available