AFGHAN REFUGEE INFORMATION NETWORK

Charity Number: 327194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Afghanistan Society (the charity's working name) is an independent, apolitical and non-partisan group, open to all, which aims to showcase the richness of Afghan life and culture. It aims to raise awareness and promote dialogue by arranging and supporting events in the UK that bring together those with an interest in or experience of ongoing development and cultural matters in Afghanistan.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £4,519
Total expenditure: £3,949

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Afghanistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ARIN (Working name)
  • THE AFGHANISTAN SOCIETY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MS E WINTER Chair
AFGHANAID
Received: On time
Heidi Wagner Trustee 06 August 2024
None on record
Ghulam Rasol Yalaqi Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Mirwais Wardak Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
Dr Marissa Virginia Quie Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
Kudsia Kaker Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record
SHIRAZUDDIN SIDDIQI Trustee 20 June 2019
AFGHANAID
Received: On time
Leslie Ann Charlotte Knott Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record
Mark Rainer Bowden Trustee 20 June 2019
AFGHANAID
Received: On time
MR R ARGUILE Trustee
THE PUTNEY SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.33k £1.73k £2.41k £574 £4.52k
Total expenditure £2.50k £749 £2.26k £1.28k £3.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 06 April 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 BURSTOCK ROAD
LONDON
SW15 2PW
Phone:
02087884554
Website:

No information available