Financial history CWLWM MONDULI

Charity number: 327330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £1.34k £2.95k £683 £2.15k £1.52k
Total expenditure £20 £6.05k £30 £2.69k £1.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A