Financial history CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS' LIVERY CHARITY

Charity Number: 327681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £230.66k £219.90k £235.93k £221.10k £237.39k
Total expenditure £306.95k £282.08k £214.34k £200.46k £218.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A