CENTRE FOR STUDIES ON INCLUSIVE EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CSIE works to promote equality and eliminate discrimination in education. Every child or young person, therefore, should feel welcome, visible and respected, regardless of attainment, gender, gender identity, ethnic/cultural background, impairment, or any other perceived or actual difference. Activities include talks, training, consultancy, research and the production of resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £28,479 from 2 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 May 1988: Standard registration
- C S I E (Working name)
- CENTRE FOR STUDIES ON INTEGRATION IN EDUCATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Stobbs | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sloper | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr STUART BURGESS | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
SUE SANDERS | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.93k | £35.08k | £77.88k | £66.27k | £212.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.67k | £59.54k | £76.55k | £62.85k | £191.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £295 | N/A | £26.60k | £28.48k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 25 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 25 June 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/05/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/01/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND /OR TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AT RISK OF DISCRIMINATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD, BY PROMOTING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE IN ALL MATTERS CONCERNING INCLUSIVE EDUCATION IN MAINSTREAM PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS, EARLY YEARS SETTINGS, COLLEGES, HIGHER EDUCATION INSTITUTIONS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL SETTINGS. TO DO SO IN WAYS THAT PROMOTE EQUALITY, MINIMISE DISCRIMINATION AND REMOVE BARRIERS TO LEARNING AND PARTICIPATION FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IRRESPECTIVE OF ANY DIFFERENCES, FOR EXAMPLE DISCRIMINATION WITH REGARD TO PERCEIVED ABILITY, DISABILITY, SOCIOECONOMIC BACKGROUND, GENDER, GENDER IDENTITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, ETHNICITY, RELIGION OR BELIEF.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Park Centre
Daventry Road
Bristol
BS4 1DQ
- Phone:
- 01173533150
- Email:
- admin@csie.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window