THE EXTRACARE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accommodation, an active lifestyle and an independent, safe and secure future for older people in need of a stimulating and supportive environment through the development and operation of a network of inspirational communities in supported housing schemes and retirement villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£65,957,000
Donations and legacies | £1.56m | |
Charitable activities | £60.61m | |
Other trading activities | £2.94m | |
Investments | £852.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£83,170,000
Raising funds | £1.16m | |
Charitable activities | £79.34m | |
Other | £2.67m |
£40,065,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £17,942,173 from 22 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.83m | |
Charitable expenditure | £79.34m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.83m | |
Charitable expenditure | £79.34m | |
Retained for future use | £22.85m |
People

1282 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
2109 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 22 |
£70k to £80k | 9 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 May 1988: Standard registration
- CCHA EXTRA CARE LIMITED (Previous name)
- EXTRA CARE LIMITED (Previous name)
- SHERBOURNE EXTRA CARE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Jeffery | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Towe | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma De Brito | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Swabel | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Patricia Houlis | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Richard Chamberlain | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Kim Wootton | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Byrne | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ian Hardy | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Baldwin | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Adrian Eggington | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clarke | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.19m | £41.68m | £47.52m | £53.91m | £65.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.70m | £49.38m | £53.85m | £67.19m | £83.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £15.09m | £6.35m | £6.12m | £15.47m | £17.94m | |
|
Income from government grants | £644.00k | £3.58m | £23.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.46m | £630.00k | £1.26m | £1.47m | £1.56m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.24m | £2.33m | £2.90m | £3.05m | £2.94m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £39.47m | £38.72m | £42.83m | £49.15m | £60.61m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £18.00k | £6.00k | £526.00k | £246.00k | £852.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £47.46m | £46.61m | £50.33m | £63.34m | £79.34m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.24m | £397.00k | £993.00k | £1.09m | £1.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £105.00k | £120.00k | £113.00k | £110.00k | £146.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £2.37m | £2.53m | £2.76m | £2.67m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £178.71m | £126.41m | £124.73m | £131.81m | £135.75m | |
|
Long-term investments | £650.60m | £744.45m | £767.31m | £812.86m | £851.46m | |
|
Other assets | £8.71m | £7.27m | £34.29m | £50.17m | £53.32m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£4.76m | -£9.24m | -£6.77m | -£6.61m | -£6.62m | |
|
Total liabilities | £585.97m | £603.22m | £636.63m | £676.65m | £699.48m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/12/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/04/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2014 as amended on 13 Nov 2019 as amended on 07 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO CARRY ON: (A) THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING (DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY) AND MANAGING THE PROVISION OF: (I) HOUSING, SOCIAL HOUSING AND OTHER ACCOMMODATION (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, NURSING HOMES, SHELTERED HOMES, HOSTELS AND CARE HOMES), AND (II) ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE, AND (III) ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES OR SERVICES, FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE POOR, OR FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, PHYSICAL DISABILITY, MENTAL DISABILITY, LEARNING DISABILITY, MENTAL ILLNESS OR CHRONIC SICKNESS. (B) THE PROVISION OF CARE, WELFARE, MEDICAL, NURSING, COMMUNITY AND OTHER SERVICES, AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES, FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE POOR, OR FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, PHYSICAL DISABILITY, MENTAL DISABILITY, LEARNING DISABILITY, MENTAL ILLNESS OR CHRONIC SICKNESS. (C) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO ARE POOR, OR OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, PHYSICAL DISABILITY, MENTAL DISABILITY, LEARNING DISABILITY, MENTAL ILLNESS OR CHRONIC SICKNESS. (D) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE. (E) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT NOT PROHIBITED FOR A COMPANY REGISTERED WITH THE REGULATOR AS A NON-PROFIT PRIVATE REGISTERED PROVIDER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 HARRY WESTON ROAD
BINLEY BUSINESS PARK
BINLEY
COVENTRY
CV3 2SN
- Phone:
- 02476506011
- Email:
- privacy@extracare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window