THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 327829
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making of grants out of either capital or income to Charitable organisations for use in connection with their work. The main beneficiaries are Charities working for the beneift of animals, old and young people particularly in the Gloucestershire area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2019

Total income: £51,244
Total expenditure: £10,730

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 June 1988: Standard registration
  • 22 July 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 803680 CANINE PARTNERS FOR INDEPENDENCE
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1095050 COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING INTERNATIONAL
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1053055 MERCY SHIPS - U.K LTD
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 281797 Young Gloucestershire Limited
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 209642 ANIMAL HEALTH TRUST
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 298627 LONGFIELD HOSPICE CARE
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 227523 DOGS TRUST LEGACY
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 216401 THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY...
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 299821 CIRENCESTER HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 209617 THE GUIDE DOGS FOR THE BLIND ASSOCIATION
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1081849 WORLD ANIMAL PROTECTION
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 219279 THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 220949 THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 261017 MACMILLAN CANCER SUPPORT
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 210119 ROYAL STAR & GARTER
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1085760 THE BROOKE HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 216250 BARNARDO'S
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 209603 THE ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 226227 THE ROYAL NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF BLIND PEOPLE
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 208217 THE PEOPLE'S DISPENSARY FOR SICK ANIMALS
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1061359 WINSTON'S WISH (A GRIEF SUPPORT PROGRAMME FOR CHIL...
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 233574 Animal Action Greece
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 206658 WORLD HORSE WELFARE
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1143118 MIDLANDS AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1128090 THE OUTWARD BOUND TRUST
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 314301 THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE COUNTY PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIAT...
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 233179 COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND
  • 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 214779 THE SALVATION ARMY
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Total gross income £19.88k £18.40k £23.80k £18.31k £51.24k
Total expenditure £33.12k £26.23k £27.10k £22.58k £10.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 May 2020 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 27 May 2020 112 days late
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 22 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required