THE SION COMMUNITY FOR EVANGELISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The furtherance and advancement of the Christian religion, as held by the Roman Catholic church (in particular, but not exclusively, by preaching and teaching). This is done through organising formal talks and seminars, missions within parishes and primary schools, youth camps, conferences and special youth missions. Our conference facilities are used to train members and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Jersey
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 October 1988: Standard registration
- SION COMMUNITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER BROOKES | Chair | 24 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael John Hall | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Clare Walsh | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Marian Long | Trustee | 07 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE MARY MORAN | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas D Wells | Trustee | 29 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £284.23k | £278.02k | £243.01k | £246.59k | £272.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.94k | £209.14k | £203.77k | £224.99k | £270.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/10/1988 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/01/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE FURTHERANCE AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WITHIN THE METHOD AND TEACHING OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH BY IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) PREACHING AND TEACHING AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH SHALL PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sion Catholic Community
Sawyers Hall Lane
BRENTWOOD
CM15 9BX
- Phone:
- 01277215011
- Email:
- admin@sioncommunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window