THE JEWISH CENTRE FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION (LIMUDEI HASHEM) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support a Special Needs school in Israel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 06 January 1989: Standard registration
- THE JEWISH CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION ("LIMUDEI HASHEM") TRUST (Previous name)
- THE JEWISH CENTRE FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION ("LIMUDEI HASHEM") TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROCHELLE BRENIG | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||
MICHAEL LEBRETT | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57k | £2.00k | £1.00k | £500 | £600 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62k | £1.52k | £0 | £120 | £1.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO PLAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OF THE INCOME AND CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND IN SUCH MANNER AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE TO OR TOWARDS OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (I) FOR THE MAINTENANCE, MANAGEMENT, CONDUCT AND ADMINISTRATION OF THE SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER SCHOOLS OR SIMILAR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS CATERING FOR THE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (II) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT AND FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND (III) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT AND FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION) OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRENTMEAD HOUSE
BRITANNIA RD
LONDON
N12 9RU
- Phone:
- 02084466767
- Email:
- lfinnco@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window