MORNING STAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To share God's love and the good news about the offer of forgiveness and a relationship with God through Jesus. To enable people to develop physically, mentally, emotionally and spiritually, so that they may make or increase their contribution to society. To deliver the above objects primarily through means of sail training for the benefit of people from all backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Verity Thomas | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ratcliffe | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Walters | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Maria Varey | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Adams | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Tony Ingall | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.25k | £214.83k | £211.01k | £250.39k | £237.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.28k | £180.55k | £189.85k | £311.78k | £270.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 AUGUST 1989 as amended on 09 Oct 2021 as amended on 27 Nov 2021 as amended on 16 May 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST TOGETHER WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ARTICLES. (B) THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THE PROVISION FOR THEM OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPTION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Morning Star Trust
43 Woodridge Close
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN2 8HJ
- Phone:
- 01243 908026
- Email:
- info@mst.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window