Financial history BORTH SPORTS AND PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1062908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.61k £48.68k £31.84k £34.33k £27.03k
Total expenditure £18.85k £18.03k £23.18k £32.74k £53.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.00k £39.00k £26.00k £16.02k £0