CRANSTOUN

Charity number: 1061582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Cranstoun is a not-for-profit, independent, non-govermental organisation providing a range of high quality, specialist services to tackle the impact and harm caused by drugs and/or alcohol to individuals and communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 March 1997: Standard registration
  • 16 May 2023: Funds received from 1074891 SWANSWELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CRANSTOUN DRUG SERVICES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lesleigh Bounds Chair 22 May 2019
None on record
Winston North Trustee 06 November 2024
THE FRIENDS OF ST HELEN'S CHURCH
Received: On time
Laura Mayes Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Emma Dearnaley Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Cherag Patel Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Gary Ritchie Trustee 24 April 2024
CROSS SECTOR SAFETY AND SECURITY COMMUNICATIONS
Received: On time
Dr Gail Gilchrist Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Suaimhneas Naomi Burke-Shyne Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Andy Furlong Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Alastair Graham Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Dr Anne Campbell Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
David Alcock Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.10m £16.30m £20.00m £22.16m £25.98m
Total expenditure £19.73m £16.28m £19.04m £22.39m £25.25m
Income from government contracts £18.75m £16.26m £20.00m £19.22m £22.13m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.15m £2.87m
Income - Donations and legacies £15.00k £36.00k £3.00k £2.00k £42.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £19.78m £16.26m £20.00m £22.08m £25.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £34.00k £5.00k £1.00k £80.00k £250.00k
Income - Other £4.26m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £36.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.73m £16.28m £19.04m £22.34m £25.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £55.00k £132.00k
Expenditure - Governance £90.00k £0 £0 £69.00k £87.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.38m £256.00k £214.00k £256.00k £246.00k
Long-term investments £0 £1.27m £1.33m £1.28m £6.19m
Other assets £9.08m £9.60m £12.83m £11.70m £7.78m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.88m £3.32m £5.54m £4.69m £4.83m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 July 2023 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 July 2023 177 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Thames Mews
Portsmouth Road
Esher
SURREY
KT10 9AD
Phone:
02083351830