Trustees PARTNERSHIP FOR YOUNG LONDON

Charity number: 1062226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Griffiths Trustee 07 May 2025
None on record
Aisling Cohn Trustee 07 May 2025
None on record
Kelly Thomas Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Finn Grant Trustee 27 September 2023
WALTHAM FOREST COMMUNITY HUB
Received: On time
Chigoziem Mottoh Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Troy Norbert Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Sarah Jo Loveday Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Suzanne Wood Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Fenella Boyle Trustee 04 September 2017
None on record
Keith Bottomley CC Trustee 06 June 2016
THE GUILD OF THE ROYAL HOSPITAL OF ST BARTHOLOMEW
Received: On time
THOMAS FREDERICK MAUTNER JP, FIMI Trustee
None on record