LONDON CATALYST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as a catalyst through a programme of grant making, to include:- (1) providing grants to agencies best placed to distribute one-off grants to people in need; and (2) projects tackling unmet health needs and the affects of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 December 1997: Standard registration
- METROPOLITAN HOSPITAL - SUNDAY FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Naureen Bhatti | Chair | 07 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Jane Hill | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Grey | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andriy Voshchevskyy | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ross Wildlake Wilson | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Rittner | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Lloyd Cuff | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dela Glevey | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Groux | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Durack | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
DANNY DALY | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Whitby | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £328.73k | £229.42k | £252.83k | £282.71k | £339.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £435.00k | £436.65k | £429.73k | £483.79k | £477.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 November 2020 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 4 NOVEMBER 1997 AND AMENDED 25 JUNE 2009. SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 25 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS DISABILITY AND INFIRMITY AMONG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA BOUNDED BY THE M25 LONDON ORBITAL MOTORWAY OR PERSONS WHO HAVE A REAL AND SUBSTANTIAL CONNECTION WITH SUCH AREA OR ANY PART OF IT, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY SUPPORTING HOSPITALS, HOSPICES, HOMES, MEDICAL SCHOOLS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR THE AFOREMENTIONED PURPOSES AND BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR USE BY SOCIAL WORKERS TO ASSISTS INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Catalyst
45 Westminster Bridge Road
LONDON
SE1 7JB
- Phone:
- 02038284204
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window