Financial history Royal Academy Trust

Charity number: 1067270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.26m £951.03k £2.07m £1.48m £1.52m
Total expenditure £2.59m £3.26m £1.20m £3.85m £2.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £642.84k £338.80k £1.17m £493.17k £209.69k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £375.00k £0 £0
Income - Investment £618.88k £612.23k £899.69k £988.68k £1.31m
Income - Other £1.44m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £500.03k £287.80k £598.36k £425.80k £6.85k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.38m £2.97m £1.06m £3.73m £1.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £209.05k £289.76k £146.65k £124.59k £203.79k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £19.02k £23.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.38m £2.97m £1.06m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £73.11k £205.15k £58.49k £36.37k £110.20k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0