Royal Academy Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust is the maintenance, development, advancement and preservation of the Royal Academy of Arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£1,518,840
Donations and legacies | £209.69k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.31m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,080,869
Raising funds | £203.79k | |
Charitable activities | £1.88m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,722,014 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £203.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.88m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £203.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.88m | |
Retained for future use | £2.16m |
People

1 Employee(s)
22 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 January 1998: Standard registration
- ROYAL ACADEMY DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL ACADEMY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Kate Maclaine Mitchell | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sebastien Mazella di Bosco | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ephson OBE | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Reuben | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bianca Roden | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Paulo Pereira | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Moriarty-MacDonnell | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Tennant | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katy Wickremesinghe | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elbert O'Neal Robinson Jr | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Bollinger | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rowland Tudor St John | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lady Ina Sarikhani Weston | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PESH FRAMJEE | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|||||
ROBERT WILLIAM GUY YERBURGH | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Salter PRA | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Batia Ofer | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aryeh Bourkoff | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Clore | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Scott Mead | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dame Carolyn Julia McCall DBE | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE HUMBY | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.26m | £951.03k | £2.07m | £1.48m | £1.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.59m | £3.26m | £1.20m | £3.85m | £2.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £642.84k | £338.80k | £1.17m | £493.17k | £209.69k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £375.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £618.88k | £612.23k | £899.69k | £988.68k | £1.31m | |
|
Income - Other | £1.44m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £500.03k | £287.80k | £598.36k | £425.80k | £6.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.38m | £2.97m | £1.06m | £3.73m | £1.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £209.05k | £289.76k | £146.65k | £124.59k | £203.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £19.02k | £23.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.38m | £2.97m | £1.06m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £73.11k | £205.15k | £58.49k | £36.37k | £110.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £46.33m | £52.75m | £52.87m | £50.03m | £52.17m | |
|
Other assets | £784.82k | £113.24k | £313.14k | £302.45k | £313.32k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £452.32k | £548.55k | £65.45k | £137.03k | £124.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 FEBRUARY 1981 AND SCHEME DATED 20TH APRIL 1998. AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2016 as amended on 06 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS IN LONDON THROUGH WHICH IN THE WORDS OF ITS INSTRUMENT OF FOUNDATION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS LAWS AS APPROVED BY THE SOVEREIGN THE ARTS OF DESIGN MAY BE PROMOTED INCLUDING:- (1) THE MAINTENANCE PRESERVATION AND CARE OF ANY BUILDINGS AND POSSESSIONS AT ANY TIME OR FROM TIME TO TIME OCCUPIED OR OWNED BY THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS AND HELD ON CHARITABLE TRUSTS (2) THE PRESENTATION OF THE ANNUAL EXHIBITION (AS DEFINED IN SECTION VI OF THE LAWS OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS IN LONDON) AND LOAN EXHIBITIONS PREPARED AND MOUNTED FOR THE BENEFIT BOTH OF SCHOLAR AND LAYMAN (3) THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY SCHOOLS AS A MEANS OF PROVIDING TRAINING IN THE FINE ARTS (4) THE PRESERVATION OF DIPLOMA WORKS AND OF A LIBRARY OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS AS A CENTRE OF REFERENCE FOR THE FINE ARTS (5) THE MAINTENANCE PRESERVATION AND ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS ARE FROM TIME TO TIME SUPPORTED BY THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURLINGTON HOUSE
PICCADILLY
LONDON
W1J 0BD
- Phone:
- 02073008017
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window