Financial history THE GREATER MANCHESTER BENGALI HINDU CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1068094
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £25.49k £4.85k £24.86k £16.78k £15.43k
Total expenditure £13.39k £11.88k £16.31k £19.09k £13.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A