Financial history HOMELESS ACTION

Charity number: 1063208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £4.18m £3.96m £3.66m £3.29m £2.99m
Total expenditure £4.25m £4.20m £3.81m £3.03m £2.78m
Income from government contracts N/A £172.95k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.00k £68.61k £8.96k £10.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £53.32k £70.53k £22.84k £48.46k £144.99k
Income - Other trading activities £40.64k £14.54k £0 £0 £9.33k
Income - Charitable activities £4.07m £3.87m £3.62m £3.22m £2.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.26k £1.07k £1.78k £9.71k £27.39k
Income - Other £9.13k £8.32k £7.86k £4.56k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.23m £4.19m £3.81m £3.03m £2.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £14.15k £3.14k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £102.81k £6.25k £7.35k £7.56k £8.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £22.81k £0 £0 £0 £0