Financial history THE MOZARTISTS

Charity Number: 1063387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £674.48k £427.10k £474.72k £533.27k £609.95k
Total expenditure £760.99k £376.66k £440.61k £499.75k £567.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £43.05k £157.78k N/A £20.90k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £490.32k N/A N/A £353.55k £436.58k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £120.43k N/A N/A £90.19k £75.85k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.10k N/A N/A £4.62k £10.42k
Income - Other £62.64k N/A N/A £84.90k £87.11k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £1.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £647.63k N/A N/A £462.54k £502.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds £113.36k N/A N/A £37.21k £65.16k
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k N/A N/A £2.50k £6.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0