Financial history COMMUNITY FOREST TRUST

Charity number: 1072706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.29m £3.14m £7.40m £9.81m £11.58m
Total expenditure £2.49m £2.81m £5.46m £11.78m £10.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.21m N/A £2.43m £3.45m £10.62m
Income - Donations and legacies £99.56k £97.56k £185.78k £42.72k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.18m £3.03m £7.21m £6.06m £11.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.27k £11.19k £6.26k £41.36k £86.90k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.67m £187.10k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.46m £2.81m £5.39m £5.45m £10.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.17k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.88k £5.55k £20.87k £17.07k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £972.33k £867.30k £1.78m £4.31m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.20k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £75.47k £6.33m £331.27k