Financial history OXFORDSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST

Charity number: 1064776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £130.89k £142.13k £185.18k £241.18k £185.03k
Total expenditure £154.94k £158.44k £159.13k £153.97k £154.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A