EUXTON CONTACT CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For non-resident parent to have contact with their separated children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 31 July 1997: Standard registration
- 14 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 14 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1135868 CHORLEY AND LEYLAND METHODIST CIRCUIT
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35 | £2.43k | £135 | £198 | £1.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £975 | £968 | £1.19k | £1.61k | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ELEVIATE THE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN RESIDENT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT CAUSED BY THE BREAK UP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A CENTRE OF FACILITY WHEREBY SUCH CHILDREN CAN MORE READILY ENJOY THE COMPANY AND LOVE OF THEIR NON RESIDENTIAL PARENT
Area of benefit
PRESTON, CHORLEY, SOUTH RIBBLE AND WEST LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window