J M DIXON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes grants to organisations in the parish of Mickleton that are involved in the fields of education,literature,arts, science and technology and in the fields of physical education and domestic economy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Chambers | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Smith | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Robin Charles Coldicott | Trustee |
|
||||||
RACHEL YATES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.51k | £27.60k | £22.33k | £23.92k | £25.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.44k | £21.32k | £26.66k | £22.61k | £27.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 26 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ANCIENT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MICKLETON BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN LITERATURE, THE ARTS, SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND OF PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DOMESTIC ECONOMICS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) LECTURES AND CLASSES; (2) THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS FOR A PARISH LIBRARY; (3) THE CONTRIBUTION TO THE MAINTENANCE OF ANY INSTITUTION WITHIN THE PARISH HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS IN WHOLE OR IN PART (WHETHER UNDER THE CONTROL OF THE TRUSTEES OR NOT); (4) THE PURCHASE, REPAIR OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE FURNITURE OR PLANT OF ANY SUCH INSTITUTION; AND (5) ANYTHING INCIDENTAL TO THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ANCIENT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MICKLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
KIFTSGATE COURT
MICKLETON
CHIPPING CAMPDEN
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL55 6LN
- Phone:
- 01386438777
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window