THE NANCY OLDFIELD TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sailing and similar activities for disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 March 1998: Standard registration
- NANCY OLDFIELD TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary James | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Simon Smith | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon George | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Jasper Copping | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hawes | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Lennard-Jones | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diane Florence Harber | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|||||
VAL KHAMBATTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £475.21k | £150.94k | £328.65k | £327.83k | £313.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.71k | £277.94k | £281.52k | £257.90k | £327.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £68.62k | £11.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
)TO SUPPORT AND ASSIST PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING, CANOEING, BOATING AND OTHER WATER BASED ACTIVITIES TOGETHER WITH BIRDWATCHING, ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES AND/OR OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING AND ENHANCING THEIR LIFE EXPERIENCE. B)THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION, OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING, CANOEING, BOATING AND OTHER WATER BASED ACTIVITIES TOGETHER WITH BIRDWATCHING, ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES AND/OR OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. C)SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES (WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE) BEING CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
IRSTEAD ROAD
NEATISHEAD
NORWICH
NR12 8BJ
- Phone:
- 01692 630572
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window