Financial history THE EXETER ICE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1071619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £106.32k £59.90k £62.69k £58.90k £64.77k
Total expenditure £74.74k £65.30k £61.13k £70.31k £62.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A