STAMFORD HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE (SHYP)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the relief of homelessness and suffering in Stamford amongst mainly, but not exclusively, young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 14 July 1999: Standard registration
- 01 March 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1162761 STAMFORD FOODBANK
- 01 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1097217 CHRISTIANS AGAINST POVERTY
- 01 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1129379 ALTERNATIVES STAMFORD
- 01 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1123481 Building Resilience In Communities
- 01 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1158271 THE EVERGREEN CARE TRUST
- SHYP TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.56k | £9.66k | £5.65k | £3.53k | £3.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.18k | £21.85k | £6.70k | £5.12k | £2.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 14 August 2016 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 08 July 2015 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 01 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST THE RELIEF OF HOMELESSNESS AND SUFFERING IN THE TOWN OF STAMFORD LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS AMONGST MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF CREED COLOUR OR POLITICAL BELIEF AND TO THAT END ITS AIMS ARE: TO ASSIST WITH THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF SUCH PEOPLE IN NEED: TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE ACCESS FOR PEOPLE IN NEED TO THE PRIVATE SECTOR RENTED ACCOMMODATION: TO PROVIDE HELP AND PRACTICAL OR FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS WHO ARE ALREADY OFFERING HELP OR ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PEOPLE IN NEED: TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PEOPLE IN NEED: TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL TO THE ATTAINMENTS OF THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
TOWN OF STAMFORD LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window