MISSION AVIATION FELLOWSHIP UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAF uses light aircraft to transform the lives of some of the world's most isolated people in need. Working in partnership with hundreds of other Christian and humanitarian organisations, MAF delivers help, hope and healing to remote and inaccessible communities in the developing world. MAF UK is the largest provider of resources for MAF International's work within the MAF global partnership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£13,996,000
Donations and legacies | £13.85m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £146.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£15,739,000
Raising funds | £2.61m | |
Charitable activities | £13.13m | |
Other | £0 |
£84,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.61m | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.13m |
People

92 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
429 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Australia
- Chad
- East Timor
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Nepal
- Papua New Guinea
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 25 September 1997: Standard registration
- 11 October 2023: Funds received from 1178711 NORTH SHIELDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- 17 September 2024: Funds received from 290227 AUCTIONS FOR CHRISTIAN MISSION
- 13 November 2024: Funds received from 277472 THE CLUMBER CHARITABLE TRUST
- 11 December 2024: Funds received from 1003939 HETTY GEORGE DRC TRUST
- MAF UK (Working name)
- MISSION AVIATION FELLOWSHIP UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Matheson | Trustee | 13 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
GORDON MAY | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||||
ANDREW STRANG MACLAY | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Clare Tunbridge | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann Saunders | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM NAIRN LOWE | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Carl Knightly | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Osei-Mensah | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Max Gove | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Burton | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.68m | £12.65m | £13.79m | £15.97m | £14.00m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.51m | £12.26m | £12.60m | £17.12m | £15.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.00k | N/A | £38.00k | £21.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £11.63m | £12.63m | £13.78m | £15.91m | £13.85m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £54.00k | £17.00k | £12.00k | £60.00k | £146.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.84m | £2.91m | £4.61m | £4.89m | £3.76m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.12m | £10.15m | £10.47m | £14.96m | £13.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.39m | £2.12m | £2.12m | £2.16m | £2.61m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £29.00k | £18.00k | £19.00k | £24.00k | £29.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £6.08m | £5.50m | £5.56m | £7.06m | £6.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £91.00k | £50.00k | £83.00k | £48.00k | £36.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.03m | £1.08m | |
|
Other assets | £7.73m | £8.23m | £9.56m | £8.09m | £6.90m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £342.00k | £416.00k | £588.00k | £1.25m | £1.76m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY SUCH MEANS AS THE CHARITY SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING THE WORK OF MISSION AVIATION, CHURCHES, MISSIONS AND RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT AGENCIES SO THAT THE LOVE OF CHRIST IS SHARED BY WORD AND PRACTICAL MEANS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MISSION AVIATION FELLOWSHIP
CASTLE HOUSE
CASTLE HILL AVENUE
FOLKESTONE
CT20 2TQ
- Phone:
- 01303850950
- Email:
- maf@maf-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window