ST SILAS (CONTINUING CHURCH) TRUST

Charity number: 1066733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Holding Sunday Services and occasional meetings and services. Meetings of Trustees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,903
Total expenditure: £3,923

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire
  • Staffordshire
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 December 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST SILAS CHURCH OF ENGLAND - CONTINUING (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PETER RATCLIFF Chair 12 March 2015
THE ASSOCIATION OF THE CONTINUING CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher James Richards Trustee 22 October 2020
THE ASSOCIATION OF THE CONTINUING CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
Rt Rev EDWARD JOHN MALCOLM Trustee 12 March 2015
THE PROTESTANT TRUTH SOCIETY (INC)
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION OF THE CONTINUING CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE GOSPEL MAGAZINE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.57k £4.66k £5.01k £4.34k £7.90k
Total expenditure £3.70k £2.08k £3.56k £15.32k £3.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 GREENFELS RISE
DUDLEY
DY2 7TP
Phone:
01384259781
Website:

No information available