FOCAL POINT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is staffed by volunteers from local Churches & open 15hrs a week for trading & consultation. Monies accured are used to help those in poverty & to support other Community projects,.with referrals for those families in crisis from other professional Bodies. F.P works closely with local Churches and trades people in providing food hampers and other assistance etc, .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 11 March 1998: Standard registration
- FOCAL POINT COMMUNITY CARE (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Jones | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Blackburn | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kiff | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Thomas Lewis | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.44k | £11.78k | £13.53k | £9.05k | £12.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.86k | £6.20k | £4.85k | £8.64k | £18.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.00k | £7.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22 OCTOBER 1997, AS AMENDED 4 MARCH 1998 AND 18 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Focal Point
9 Waunrhydd Road
Tonyrefail
PORTH
RCT
CF39 8EN
- Phone:
- 01443672565
- Email:
- focal.point@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window