Financial history MIDDLEPORT ENVIRONMENT CENTRE

Charity number: 1068872
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £572 £3.21k £189 £719 £2.19k
Total expenditure £15.85k £6.71k £30.19k £13.86k £11.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A