BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE GIBRALTAR KOLLEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides assistance for education, poverty and religious projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Gibraltar
- Israel
Governance
- 02 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RABBI ABRAHAM HASSAN | Chair |
|
||||||
YAMIN IBGUI | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOE COHEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARIEL SAMUEL BELILO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NISSIM HASSAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £465.36k | £183.89k | £264.77k | £115.50k | £62.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.67k | £558.73k | £107.58k | £266.00k | £61.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 DECEMBER 1997 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENT DEED 4 AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE JEWISH FAITH IN GIBRALTAR AND OTHER PLACES BY ASSISTING YOUNG MEN OF THE JEWISH FAITH TO BECOME RABBIS. 2) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. 3) TO PROVIDE SUBSTANTIAL SUPPORT FOR JEWISH EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES IN SYNAGOGUES.
Area of benefit
GIBRALTAR AND OTHER PLACES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 HOLDEN ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4NL
- Phone:
- 01617430207
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window