ODIHAM AND DISTRICT ROTARY CLUB CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 1068197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raise funds for local. international and Rotary charities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £14,252
Total expenditure: £14,746

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ODIHAM AND HOOK ROTARY CLUB (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Howard James Swalheim Trustee 05 August 2024
THE CROSS BARN ODIHAM
Received: On time
Paul John Cluett Trustee 05 August 2024
None on record
Elaine Veronica Bennett Trustee 05 August 2024
None on record
John Stuart Orchard Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Douglas Bryan Berry Trustee 01 July 2023
IBM UNITED KINGDOM TRUST
Charity is insolvent
Alison Harris Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Graham Deverill Trustee 01 July 2018
FRIENDS OF NEW BYWAYS
Received: On time
ODIHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL COMBINED TRUSTS (INCORPORATING THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF OCH) LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.19k £10.34k £14.44k £12.53k £14.25k
Total expenditure £13.68k £8.85k £13.23k £14.37k £14.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 17 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Barley House
Hook Road
North Warnborough
HOOK
Hampshire
RG29 1EU
Phone:
07976 229564
Website:

No information available