Financial history EMMAUS GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity number: 1067483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.11m £831.86k £939.56k £913.35k £1.05m
Total expenditure £891.25k £796.37k £747.22k £760.50k £782.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £118.19k £137.70k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £274.39k £292.52k £252.70k £61.32k £66.97k
Income - Other trading activities £619.97k £392.11k £585.98k £731.33k £790.53k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £90.22k £106.13k £168.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £202.50k £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.99k £2.55k £9.69k £14.58k £20.75k
Income - Other £216.23k £144.69k £971 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £1.93k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £891.25k £796.37k £747.22k £760.50k £782.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.28k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0