ODIHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL COMBINED TRUSTS (INCORPORATING THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF OCH) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Odiham Cottage Hospital Charitable Trust provides health and social care the the residents of West Hart and Old Basing, Hampshire. Its services include being the base for the NHS community nursing team and their medical clinics, the Rosefield Day Centre for the elderly, specialist clinics run by St Michaels Hospice and counselling services run by Hart Voluntary Action.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 March 1998: Standard registration
- 17 July 2014: Funds received from 258638 THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ODIHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL
- OCHCT (Working name)
- OCHRE (Working name)
- ODIHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- ODIHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL REDEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jane Ann Worlock | Chair | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Mayes | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chris Hunter | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Rowlandson | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr HELENA HEYWOOD | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Deverill | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Ian MacDonald | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264.61k | £175.22k | £216.53k | £266.56k | £274.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.36k | £281.76k | £247.57k | £255.70k | £275.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/07/2014 as amended on 22 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY A) PURCHASING, OWNING, RUNNING AND MAINTAINING THE ODIHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL ("OCH"), BURYFIELDS, ODIHAM, HOOK, HAMPSHIRE RG29 1NE B) DEVELOPING OCH AND ANY OTHER PROPERTY FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES C) OCH TO BE PROVIDED AS A BASE FOR THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AND SOCIAL CARE. SUCH CARE MAY BE PROVIDED BOTH: I) IN OCH THROUGH INPATIENT BEDS, OUTPATIENT CLINICS AND APPOINTMENTS, DAY CARE ACTIVITIES AND COMMUNITY GROUP ACTIVITIES II) IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY THROUGH ASSOCIATED SERVICES BASED AT OCH D) SUCH CARE TO BE PROVIDED PRIMARILY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE RESIDENTS OF ODIHAM, HOOK, HARTLEY WINTNEY, OLD BASING AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES E) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO MEDICAL AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES IN THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
ODIHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
OCH CHARITABLE TRUST
ODIHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL
BURYFIELDS
ODIHAM
HOOK
RG29 1NE
- Phone:
- 01256393603
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window