Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTH FORELAND TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1068471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.65k £11.64k £2.22k £3.08k £4.32k
Total expenditure £23.75k £10.07k £7.66k £3.02k £4.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A