CLOCKHOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the benefits of the inhabitants of the London Borough of Greenwich, especially the Woolwich Riverside LOCAL ward to provide affordable hall and room hire to local groups who service the community and work in partnership with the local authorities and communities on various community development projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £107,200 from 3 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Greenwich
Governance
- 16 February 1999: Standard registration
- 04 July 2019: Funds received from 1129049 THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD AND THE RCCG ...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ade Adegbenro | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Akilah Jeffers | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dibben | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
AYO AKINFE | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
RITA LOVETT | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
jean wong | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
carine epardaud | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.02k | £292.91k | £302.88k | £292.47k | £356.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.79k | £252.27k | £317.27k | £325.10k | £344.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £27.00k | £92.00k | N/A | £107.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | £83.50k | £92.50k | £54.51k | £60.56k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/01/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 20/2/1999, 8/10/2008 & 20/05/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH AND OF THE LOCAL WARD AND ITS ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATION IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY)
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clockhouse Community Centre
Defiance Walk
Woolwich
LONDON
SE18 5QL
- Phone:
- 02088557188
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window