WHITLEY CHAPEL PARISH HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Parish Hall Trust is to manage the day to day running of the Parish Hall and maintaining the integrity of the building so that it is fit for the purpose of hiring to local activity groups and for private hire by the public. The trust are responsible for collecting hire charges and arranging fund raising events to supply the income necessary for the day to day running costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 29 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel John Nixon | Chair | 26 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Colin Scales | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Sherrington-Scales | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Ruth Coombs-Ballard | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
MARJORIE RASTALL | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Nicola Jayne Matthews | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Henry John Henderson | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Lauren Porteus | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Monica Mary Haigh | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Marion Ann Henderson | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Lewis Short | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
LORNA COMMON | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID SOUTHERN | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|||||||
AUSTIN ILIFFE | Trustee | 17 August 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.81k | £22.03k | £42.35k | £20.62k | £10.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.81k | £15.15k | £9.95k | £39.05k | £15.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.50k | £7.85k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 January 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE PARISH HALL FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OT OTHER OPINIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HEXHAMSHIRE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitley Chapel Parish Hall
Leazes Lane
Whitley Chapel
Hexham
NE47 0HB
- Phone:
- 01434 676949
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window