NORTH DEVON AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of agriculture and horticulture for the benefit of the public in North Devon and surrounding areas and to support or assist such other charitable institutions or purposes as the company shall from time to time determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 18 September 1998: Standard registration
- NORTH DEVON SHOW (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK JOHN LEY | Chair |
|
||||||
Amber Buckpitt | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Watson | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Boundy | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Savery | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Norman | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Pyle | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Dart | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRANIA TIFFANY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
HENRY GEORGE DART | Trustee | 12 February 2015 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM FERNLEY GEORGE KIVELL | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN ALLIN | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER LEY | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH QUICK | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID SYDNEY JOHN SNOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £306.89k | £28.36k | £24.20k | £322.15k | £230.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.35k | £77.20k | £71.88k | £304.91k | £328.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2019
(These accounts |
27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26TH JUNE 1998.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN NORTH DEVON AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND TO SUPPORT OR ASSIST SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NORTH DEVON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 GEORGE ARCADE
SOUTH MOLTON
DEVON
EX36 3AB
- Phone:
- 01769573852
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window