Financial history THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY, SOUTH WALES BRANCH

Charity number: 1069188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.23k £1.04k £1.19k £2.88k £4.01k
Total expenditure £5.27k £1.31k £1.12k £4.10k £3.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A