Financial history FAMILY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1070500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £102.61k £71.94k £75.13k £53.25k £53.28k
Total expenditure £96.00k £98.12k £107.70k £153.87k £153.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A