Financial history THE BRITISH DISABLED ANGLING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £198.48k £128.31k £137.81k £206.53k £243.99k
Total expenditure £190.67k £141.45k £168.28k £235.59k £276.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A