Financial history ROCHDALE CONNECTIONS TRUST

Charity number: 1074736
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £507.16k £666.85k £608.56k £755.82k £795.26k
Total expenditure £486.71k £555.00k £555.54k £754.45k £854.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £64.47k £60.24k N/A
Income from government grants £69.10k £132.82k £7.94k £301.33k £194.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £35.72k £4.83k £6.68k £4.42k £4.73k
Income - Other trading activities £14.46k £36.25k £71.46k £83.40k £68.80k
Income - Charitable activities £456.69k £625.62k £522.45k £667.99k £720.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £292 £151 £22 £8 £1.53k
Income - Other £0 £0 £7.94k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £486.71k £535.00k £549.65k £750.44k £851.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £20.00k £0 £4.02k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £5.90k £0 £3.04k