CRANLEIGH SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in accordance with the principles of the Church of England for boys and girls, or boys only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£35,176,000
Donations and legacies | £380.00k | |
Charitable activities | £32.15m | |
Other trading activities | £2.39m | |
Investments | £236.00k | |
Other | £25.00k |
Total expenditure:
£32,038,000
Raising funds | £1.24m | |
Charitable activities | £30.80m | |
Other | £0 |
-£49,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.24m | |
Charitable expenditure | £30.80m | |
Retained for future use | £3.14m |
People

348 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 29 |
£70k to £80k | 10 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN JAMES LAJTHA MA FCIB | Chair |
|
||||||
Musonda Grace Kapotwe | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samik Mukherjee | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lye | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James House | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
FAYE NATALIE FARRANT BA | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN PETER MASKERY | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE JANE SCOTT KERR | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES HOWARD SEVERS | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY JAMES DE CARTERET TATE | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|||||
JAWDAT KHURSHID KC | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ROBERT JAMES WILKINS | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK SIMON PARKER GOING | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER MALTUS WELLS | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANJAYA GUNAPALA | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Guy Westcott BA BCL KC | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNY ANNE BROWN MA | Trustee | 18 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH BAYLISS BA | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE JANE WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROSALIND MARGARET CHESSER MA MB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.19m | £28.10m | £34.33m | £32.19m | £35.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.02m | £27.20m | £27.03m | £30.16m | £32.04m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £203.00k | £411.00k | £391.00k | £321.00k | £380.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.75m | £1.81m | £7.15m | £1.37m | £2.39m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £25.88m | £24.78m | £26.04m | £29.51m | £32.15m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £92.00k | £88.00k | £68.00k | £85.00k | £236.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.26m | £1.01m | £690.00k | £902.00k | £25.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £124.00k | £14.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £26.34m | £25.81m | £25.87m | £28.95m | £30.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.68m | £1.39m | £1.16m | £1.21m | £1.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £131.00k | £294.00k | £159.00k | £171.00k | £229.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £24.00k | £25.00k | £29.00k | £28.00k | £24.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £61.56m | £59.80m | £58.31m | £57.15m | £56.66m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.65m | £4.91m | £6.77m | £8.46m | £8.79m | |
|
Other assets | £2.38m | £1.95m | £9.95m | £4.65m | £8.48m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£525.00k | -£2.21m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £28.81m | £26.13m | £26.13m | £19.87m | £20.91m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH JULY 1998 AS AMENDED BY NEW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 12 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING, CONDUCTING, GOVERNING, CARRYING ON AND MAINTAINING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, OR ELSEWHERE, A BOARDING AND/OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR BOYS AND/OR GIRLS IN WHICH THE TEACHING SHALL BE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BRERETON SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- CRANLEIGH SCHOOL TRUST
- EDWARD PEEK SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- FRANK COCKBURN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- LEE-BLAKER ENTRANCE EXHIBITION FUND
- ROY PEARCE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP
- ST NICHOLAS LEAVING EXHIBITION FUND
- ST NICHOLAS SCHOLARSHIP ENDOWMENT FUND
- UTTERTON EXHIBITION FUND
- WHATELEY SIMMONDS SCHOLARSHIPS
- 14 August 2001 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRANLEIGH SCHOOL
HORSESHOE LANE
CRANLEIGH
GU6 8QQ
- Phone:
- 01483273666
- Email:
- enquiries@cranleigh.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window